IA SF2197 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2412. S.J. 684.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2412. S.J. 684.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to health insurance and the insurance division of the department of commerce, and providing for fees. (Formerly SSB 3047; See SF 2412.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to health insurance and the insurance division of the department of commerce, and providing for fees. (Formerly SSB 3047; See SF 2412.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2412. S.J. 684. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/05/2020 10:00AM RM G17. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Brown, Nunn, and Quirmbach. S.J. 289. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 266. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 262. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 254. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3047 (Related) 2020-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2197.
HSB543 (Related) 2020-02-12 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 263.
HF2403 (Similar To) 2020-02-17 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 282.
SF2412 (Similar To) 2020-06-05 - Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 649.
HSB543 (Related) 2020-02-12 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 263.
HF2403 (Similar To) 2020-02-17 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 282.
SF2412 (Similar To) 2020-06-05 - Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 649.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2197 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2197.html |