IA SF2412 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-05 - Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 649.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-05 - Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 649.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to health insurance and the insurance division of the department of commerce, and providing for fees.(Formerly SF 2197, SSB 3047.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to health insurance and the insurance division of the department of commerce, and providing for fees.(Formerly SF 2197, SSB 3047.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-05 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 649. |
2020-06-05 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 649. |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 696. |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 693. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 684. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 680. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3047 (Related) 2020-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2197.
HSB543 (Related) 2020-02-12 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 263.
SF2197 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2412. S.J. 684.
HF2403 (Similar To) 2020-02-17 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 282.
HSB543 (Related) 2020-02-12 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 263.
SF2197 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2412. S.J. 684.
HF2403 (Similar To) 2020-02-17 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 282.