IA SF2107 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2359. S.J. 351.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2359. S.J. 351.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act directing the department of education to convene a working group to study the impact of technology on cognitive learning.(See SF 2359.)
Title
A bill for an act directing the department of education to convene a working group to study the impact of technology on cognitive learning.(See SF 2359.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2359. S.J. 351. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2022 12:00PM Room G15. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee: J. Taylor, Carlin, and Giddens. S.J. 152. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 141. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2359 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF2107 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF2107.html |