IA SF188 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1195.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1195.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act prohibiting a governing board of a public college or university from adopting or enforcing any policy or rule that prohibits a person from carrying, transporting, or possessing a dangerous weapon producing a nonprojectile high-voltage pulse designed to immobilize a person in the buildings or on the grounds of such a college or university. (Formerly SF 120.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act prohibiting a governing board of a public college or university from adopting or enforcing any policy or rule that prohibits a person from carrying, transporting, or possessing a dangerous weapon producing a nonprojectile high-voltage pulse designed to immobilize a person in the buildings or on the grounds of such a college or university. (Formerly SF 120.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - Passed House (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Passed House (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Passed House (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1195. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1193. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1078. |
2019-04-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 979. |
2019-04-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1012. |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed House, yeas 64 nays 34. H.J. 979. |
2019-04-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1265. H.J. 978. |
2019-04-22 | House | Senate amendment H-1265 filed. H.J. 947. |
2019-04-22 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 929. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1039. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 38, nays 11. S.J. 1038. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3170, as amended. S.J. 1038. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Amendment S-3196 to S-3170 filed, adopted. S.J. 1037. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3170. S.J. 984. |
2019-04-16 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 883. |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed House, yeas 60 nays 37. H.J. 882. |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment H-1230 filed, adopted. H.J. 881. |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment H-1229 lost, as amended. H.J. 881. |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment H-1235 to H-1229 filed, adopted. H.J. 880. |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment H-1229 filed. H.J. 880. |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment H-1228 filed, lost. H.J. 879. |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 843. |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 739. |
2019-04-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-03-21 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/26/2019 8:15AM House Lounge. |
2019-03-20 | House | Subcommittee: Windschitl, Kerr and Thede. H.J. 600. |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 539. |
2019-03-13 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 536. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 603. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 39, nays 9. S.J. 600. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 235. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 228. |
Same As/Similar To
SF120 (Similar To) 2019-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 188. S.J. 235.