IA SF120 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Reported out of committee as SF 188. S.J. 235.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act prohibiting a governing board of a public college or university from adopting or enforcing any policy or rule that prohibits a person from carrying, transporting, or possessing a dangerous weapon producing a nonprojectile high-voltage pulse designed to immobilize a person in the buildings or on the grounds of such a college or university, and including civil penalties. (See SF 188.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act prohibiting a governing board of a public college or university from adopting or enforcing any policy or rule that prohibits a person from carrying, transporting, or possessing a dangerous weapon producing a nonprojectile high-voltage pulse designed to immobilize a person in the buildings or on the grounds of such a college or university, and including civil penalties. (See SF 188.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05SenateReported out of committee as SF 188. S.J. 235.
2019-01-29SenateSubcommittee: Sinclair, Rozenboom, and Wahls. S.J. 188.
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced, referred to Education. S.J. 172.

Same As/Similar To

SF188 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1195.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback