IA SF168 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2197. S.J. 207.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2197. S.J. 207.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to health services, special education support, and related services provided to children attending nonpublic schools.(See SF 2197.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to health services, special education support, and related services provided to children attending nonpublic schools.(See SF 2197.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2197. S.J. 207. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2022 3:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Cournoyer, Giddens, and Johnson. S.J. 79. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2021 2:30PM RM 111. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Giddens, and Johnson. S.J. 173. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 158. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2197 (Similar To) 2022-04-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 814.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF168 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF168.html |