IA SF2197 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 814.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 814.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the establishment of a task force related to special education support for students at nonpublic schools. (Formerly SF 168.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Title
A bill for an act providing for the establishment of a task force related to special education support for students at nonpublic schools. (Formerly SF 168.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Education Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Education Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 814. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 803. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 673. |
2022-03-30 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 750. |
2022-03-30 | House | Passed House, yeas 94, nays 0. H.J. 747. |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 645. |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on calendar. H.J. 597. |
2022-03-17 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 597. |
2022-03-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2022-03-04 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/07/2022 5:00PM House Lounge. |
2022-03-03 | House | Subcommittee: Salmon, Gjerde and Ingels. H.J. 493. |
2022-02-10 | House | Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 220. |
2022-02-09 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 216. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 239. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 287. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 238. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 207. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 202. |
Same As/Similar To
SF168 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2197. S.J. 207.