IA SF123 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2318. S.J. 358.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2318. S.J. 358.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to collaborative pharmacy practice allowing pharmacists to provide patient care and drug therapy management services.(See SF 2318.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to collaborative pharmacy practice allowing pharmacists to provide patient care and drug therapy management services.(See SF 2318.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2318. S.J. 358. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2020 12:30PM RM G17. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Greene, Garrett, and Mathis. S.J. 108. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Subcommittee: Miller-Meeks, Greene, and Mathis. S.J. 188. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 173. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2318 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF123 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF123.html |