IA SF2318 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to collaborative pharmacy practice allowing pharmacists to provide patient care and drug therapy management services. (Formerly SF 123.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to collaborative pharmacy practice allowing pharmacists to provide patient care and drug therapy management services. (Formerly SF 123.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-03-10 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/11/2020 8:15AM House Lounge. |
2020-03-05 | House | Subcommittee: Bacon, Brink and Forbes. H.J. 513. |
2020-03-05 | House | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 491. |
2020-03-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 485. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 521. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 2. S.J. 520. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5056 filed, lost. S.J. 519. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 358. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 350. |
Same As/Similar To
SF123 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2318. S.J. 358.