IA HSB568 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2253
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act regarding competitive bidding requirements for construction by a private party of property to be leased or lease-purchased by certain government entities and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act regarding competitive bidding requirements for construction by a private party of property to be leased or lease-purchased by certain government entities and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/29/2018 12:30PM House Lounge |
2018-01-23 | House | Subcommittee: Landon, Highfill, Deyoe, Meyer and Staed. H.J. 143. |
2018-01-23 | House | By COMMITTEE ON LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HF2253 (Replaced by) 2018-04-04 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 752.
SSB3110 (Related) 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2018 3:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
SSB3110 (Related) 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2018 3:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB568 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB568.html |