IA HF2253 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 752.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 752.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act regarding competitive bidding requirements for construction by a private party of property to be lease-purchased by certain government entities and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 568.) Effective 4-4-18.
Title
A bill for an act regarding competitive bidding requirements for construction by a private party of property to be lease-purchased by certain government entities and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 568.) Effective 4-4-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 752. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 733. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 733. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 809. |
2018-03-28 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 699. |
2018-03-28 | House | Passed House, ayes 59, nays 41. H.J. 698. |
2018-03-28 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8333. H.J. 697. |
2018-03-27 | House | Senate amendment H-8333 filed. H.J. 691. |
2018-03-27 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 681. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 791. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 27, nays 20. S.J. 785. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Amendment S-5183 adopted. S.J. 785. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Amendment S-5183 filed. S.J. 774. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 752. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 711. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chapman, Danielson, and Smith. S.J. 592. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 544. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 544. |
2018-03-06 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 473. |
2018-03-13 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 576. |
2018-03-07 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 513. |
2018-03-06 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 488. |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed House, ayes 57 nays 39. H.J. 467. |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment H-8174 adopted. H.J. 466. |
2018-03-05 | House | Amendment H-8174 filed. H.J. 461. |
2018-02-06 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 211. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB568 (Related) 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SSB3110 (Related) 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2018 3:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
SSB3110 (Related) 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2018 3:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge