IA SSB3110 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2253
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2018 3:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2018 3:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act regarding competitive bidding requirements for construction by a private party of property to be leased or lease-purchased by certain government entities and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act regarding competitive bidding requirements for construction by a private party of property to be leased or lease-purchased by certain government entities and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2018 3:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chapman, Feenstra, and Dvorsky. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HF2253 (Replaced by) 2018-04-04 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 752.
HSB568 (Related) 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB568 (Related) 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB3110 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB3110.html |