IA HSB540 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2277
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2299
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2299
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2277.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2277.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to prohibited conduct of a brewer with regard to wholesaler agreements.(See HF 2277.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to prohibited conduct of a brewer with regard to wholesaler agreements.(See HF 2277.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2277. |
2024-01-30 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 172. |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2024-01-18 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2024 12:30PM House Lounge. |
2024-01-10 | House | Subcommittee: Nordman, Bagniewski and Sorensen. H.J. 72. |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to Commerce. H.J. 68. |
2024-01-10 | House | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3076 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2299.
HF2277 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 926.
SF2299 (Replaced by) 2024-02-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 383.
HF2277 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 926.
SF2299 (Replaced by) 2024-02-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 383.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB540 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB540.html |