IA HSB126 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF607
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2573
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2573
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 384.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 384.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act modifying the sales and use tax exemption for the sale of certain component parts attached to or services performed on aircraft.
Title
A bill for an act modifying the sales and use tax exemption for the sale of certain component parts attached to or services performed on aircraft.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 384. |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2019 11:15AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-05 | House | Subcommittee: Maxwell, Bossman and Jacoby. H.J. 212. |
2019-02-05 | House | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
HF607 (Replaced by) 2020-03-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 513.
HF2573 (Replaced by) 2020-03-11 - Subcommittee: R. Smith, Chapman, and Giddens. S.J. 608.
HF2573 (Replaced by) 2020-03-11 - Subcommittee: R. Smith, Chapman, and Giddens. S.J. 608.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB126 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB126.html |