IA HF2573 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Subcommittee: R. Smith, Chapman, and Giddens. S.J. 608.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Subcommittee: R. Smith, Chapman, and Giddens. S.J. 608.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act modifying the sales and use tax exemption for the sale of certain component parts attached to or services performed on aircraft. (Formerly HF 607, HSB 126.)
Title
A bill for an act modifying the sales and use tax exemption for the sale of certain component parts attached to or services performed on aircraft. (Formerly HF 607, HSB 126.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - Passed House (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: R. Smith, Chapman, and Giddens. S.J. 608. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 542. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 542. |
2020-03-05 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 513. |
2020-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 566. |
2020-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 565. |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed House, yeas 89, nays 7. H.J. 492. |
2020-03-05 | House | Amendment H-8083 withdrawn. H.J. 492. |
2020-03-04 | House | Amendment H-8083 filed. H.J. 488. |
2020-03-03 | House | Fiscal note. |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 397. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB126 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 384.
HF607 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 513.
HF607 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 513.