IA HSB10 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF432
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-27 - 11:30AM; House Lounge Education.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-27 - 11:30AM; House Lounge Education.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill relating to the duties of the college student aid commission.
Title
A study bill relating to the duties of the college student aid commission.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-27 | House | 11:30AM; House Lounge Education. |
2015-01-14 | House | Education: Forristall Chair,Stanerson, and Winckler. |
2015-01-14 | House | In Education |
2015-01-14 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1053 (Related) 2015-03-04 - Voted - Education.
SF432 (Replaced by) 2015-04-02 - Referred to Education. S.J. 769.
SF432 (Replaced by) 2015-04-02 - Referred to Education. S.J. 769.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HSB10 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/HSB10.html |