IA SSB1053 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF432
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Voted - Education.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Voted - Education.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for an act relating to the duties of the college student aid commission.
Title
A study bill for an act relating to the duties of the college student aid commission.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | Senate | Voted - Education. |
2015-02-16 | Senate | 4:30PM; Senate Lobbyist Lounge Education. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | 12:30PM; Senate Lobbyist Lounge Education. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Education: Quirmbach Chair,Dvorsky, and Sinclair. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | In Education |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HSB10 (Related) 2015-01-27 - 11:30AM; House Lounge Education.
SF432 (Replaced by) 2015-04-02 - Referred to Education. S.J. 769.
SF432 (Replaced by) 2015-04-02 - Referred to Education. S.J. 769.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SSB1053 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/SSB1053.html |