IA HF592 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 952.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 952.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to licensed vehicle dealers, including vehicles for resale subject to a security interest and remote sales of motor vehicles. (Formerly HSB 168.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.
Title
A bill for an act relating to licensed vehicle dealers, including vehicles for resale subject to a security interest and remote sales of motor vehicles. (Formerly HSB 168.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 952. |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 951. |
2023-04-18 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 865. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 817. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 815. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Substituted for SF 504. S.J. 814. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 722. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Read first time, attached to SF 504. S.J. 632. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 632. |
2023-03-16 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 673. |
2023-03-16 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 671. |
2023-03-16 | House | Amendment H-1118 adopted. H.J. 671. |
2023-03-15 | House | Amendment H-1118 filed. H.J. 654. |
2023-03-02 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 483. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB168 (Related) 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 592.
SSB1181 (Related) 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 504.
SF504 (Similar To) 2023-04-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 815.
SSB1181 (Related) 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 504.
SF504 (Similar To) 2023-04-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 815.