IA SF504 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 815.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to certain place-of-business requirements for licensed motor vehicle dealers who conduct sales via the internet and deliver vehicles to buyers.(Formerly SSB 1181.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to certain place-of-business requirements for licensed motor vehicle dealers who conduct sales via the internet and deliver vehicles to buyers.(Formerly SSB 1181.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-17SenateWithdrawn. S.J. 815.
2023-04-17SenateHF 592 substituted. S.J. 814.
2023-04-17SenateAmendment S-3128 filed, adopted. S.J. 814.
2023-03-30SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 722.
2023-03-20SenateAttached to HF 592. S.J. 632.
2023-03-02SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 475.
2023-03-02SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 462.

Same As/Similar To

HSB168 (Related) 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 592.
SSB1181 (Related) 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 504.
HF592 (Similar To) 2023-04-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 952.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback