IA HSB168 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF592
Note: Legislation replaced by SF504

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 592.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to certain place-of-business requirements for licensed motor vehicle dealers who conduct sales via the internet and deliver vehicles to buyers.(See HF 592.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to certain place-of-business requirements for licensed motor vehicle dealers who conduct sales via the internet and deliver vehicles to buyers.(See HF 592.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-02HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 592.
2023-03-01HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 474.
2023-02-27HouseSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
2023-02-22HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2023 11:00AM House Lounge.
2023-02-15HouseSubcommittee: Sieck, Bagniewski and Thomson, C. H.J. 359.
2023-02-15HouseIntroduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 357.
2023-02-15HouseBy COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

SSB1181 (Related) 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 504.
HF592 (Replaced by) 2023-04-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 952.
SF504 (Replaced by) 2023-04-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 815.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback