IA HF590 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 545.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 545.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the conduct of elections, including absentee ballots and voter list maintenance activities, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HSB 213.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the conduct of elections, including absentee ballots and voter list maintenance activities, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HSB 213.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - Shall amendment H–1116, to amendment H–1107, be adopted? (Y: 37 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - Shall amendment H–1109 be adopted? (Y: 38 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - Shall amendment H–1109 be adopted? (Y: 38 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 545. |
2021-02-24 | House | SF 413 substituted. H.J. 542. |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment H-1111 withdrawn. H.J. 542. |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment H-1109 lost. H.J. 542. |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment H-1107 adopted, as amended. H.J. 541. |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment H-1117 to amendment H-1107 filed, adopted. H.J. 541. |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment H-1116 to amendment H-1107 lost. H.J. 541. |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment H-1116 to amendment H-1107 filed. H.J. 540. |
2021-02-23 | House | Amendments H-1107, H-1109 and H-1111 filed. H.J. 535. |
2021-02-23 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 474. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1199 (Related) 2021-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 413.
HSB213 (Related) 2021-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 590.
SF413 (Similar To) 2021-06-28 - Fiscal note.
HSB213 (Related) 2021-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 590.
SF413 (Similar To) 2021-06-28 - Fiscal note.