IA SF413 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the conduct of elections, including absentee ballots and voter list maintenance activities, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1199.) Effective date: 03/08/2021. Applicability date: 01/01/2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the conduct of elections, including absentee ballots and voter list maintenance activities, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1199.) Effective date: 03/08/2021. Applicability date: 01/01/2022.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 57 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - Shall amendment H–1113 be adopted? (Y: 38 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3042 be adopted? (Y: 18 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3041 be adopted? (Y: 18 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3040 be adopted? (Y: 18 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3039 be adopted? (Y: 18 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3034 be adopted? (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-28SenateFiscal note.
2021-03-08SenateSigned by Governor. S.J. 555.
2021-03-08SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 554.
2021-02-25SenateMessage from House. S.J. 461.
2021-02-24HouseImmediate message. H.J. 545.
2021-02-24HousePassed House, yeas 57 nays 37. H.J. 544.
2021-02-24HouseFiscal note.
2021-02-25HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 554.
2021-02-24HouseAmendment H-1113 lost. H.J. 543.
2021-02-24HouseSubstituted for HF 590. H.J. 542.
2021-02-24HouseSecretary's report on correction in engrossment. S.J. 460.
2021-02-23HouseAmendment H-1113 filed. H.J. 535.
2021-02-23HouseRead first time, passed on file. H.J. 529.
2021-02-23HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 529.
2021-02-23SenateImmediate message. S.J. 426.
2021-02-23SenatePassed Senate, yeas 30, nays 18. S.J. 423.
2021-02-23SenateAmendment S-3039 filed, lost. S.J. 422.
2021-02-23SenateAmendment S-3040 filed, lost. S.J. 421.
2021-02-23SenateAmendment S-3042 filed, lost. S.J. 421.
2021-02-23SenateAmendment S-3041 filed, lost. S.J. 420.
2021-02-23SenateAmendment S-3034 filed, adopted. S.J. 419.
2021-02-22SenateFiscal note.
2021-02-18SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 406.
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 402.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1199 (Related) 2021-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 413.
HSB213 (Related) 2021-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 590.
HF590 (Similar To) 2021-02-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 545.

Iowa State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF413
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF413.html
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGR/89/attachments/SF413.html
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGE/89/attachments/SF413.html
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1213804.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1214162.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1219939.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210218_SJNL.pdf#407
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210223_SJNL.pdf#419
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210223_SJNL.pdf#422
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210223_SJNL.pdf#421
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210223_SJNL.pdf#420
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210223_SJNL.pdf#423
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20210224_HJNL.pdf#543
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20210224_HJNL.pdf#544

Bill Comments

feedback