IA HSB213 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF413
Note: Legislation replaced by HF590
Note: Legislation replaced by HF590
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 590.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 590.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the conduct of elections, including absentee ballots and voter list maintenance activities, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 590.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the conduct of elections, including absentee ballots and voter list maintenance activities, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 590.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 590. |
2021-02-18 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 491. |
2021-02-16 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: Upon adjournment of House Chamber Law Library. |
2021-02-16 | House | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Boden, Mascher, Nordman and Wolfe. H.J. 439. |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 437. |
2021-02-16 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1199 (Related) 2021-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 413.
SF413 (Replaced by) 2021-06-28 - Fiscal note.
HF590 (Replaced by) 2021-02-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 545.
SF413 (Replaced by) 2021-06-28 - Fiscal note.
HF590 (Replaced by) 2021-02-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 545.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB213 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB213.html |