IA HF582 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 582.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 582.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the suspension of a child support order relative to child in need of assistance proceedings. (See HF 709.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the suspension of a child support order relative to child in need of assistance proceedings. (See HF 709.)
Sponsors
Rep. Dustin Hite [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 582. |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 467. |
2019-03-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-03-04 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/05/2019 8:15AM House Lounge. |
2019-03-05 | House | Subcommittee: Hite, Mitchell and Wolfe. H.J. 400. |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 387. |
Same As/Similar To
HF709 (Similar To) 2019-04-11 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 931.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF582 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF582.html |