IA HF426 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-21 - Withdrawn. H.J. 706.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-21 - Withdrawn. H.J. 706.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to postconviction access to a defendant's file in the possession of a law enforcement agency, county attorney, the attorney general in this state, and the defendant's previous trial or appellate attorney.(See HF 657.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to postconviction access to a defendant's file in the possession of a law enforcement agency, county attorney, the attorney general in this state, and the defendant's previous trial or appellate attorney.(See HF 657.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 706. |
2023-03-07 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 657. |
2023-03-02 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 497. |
2023-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-02-28 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2023 3:00PM RM 304.1. |
2023-02-23 | House | Subcommittee: Jones, Nordman and Olson. H.J. 418. |
2023-02-22 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 411. |
Same As/Similar To
HF657 (Similar To) 2023-03-28 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF426 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF426.html |