IA HF2695 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 16 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 891.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 891.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the judicial branch, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the judicial branch, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 891. |
2024-04-19 | House | SF 2436 substituted. H.J. 881. |
2024-04-19 | House | Amendment H-8354 adopted. H.J. 881. |
2024-04-18 | House | Amendment H-8354 filed. H.J. 874. |
2024-04-16 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2024-04-16 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 795. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3203 (Related) 2024-04-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2436.
SF2436 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 964.
SF2436 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 964.