IA SSB3203 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2436
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2695
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2695
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2436.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2436.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the judicial branch, including by modifying the judicial retirement fund and membership of district judicial nominating commissions, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 2436.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the judicial branch, including by modifying the judicial retirement fund and membership of district judicial nominating commissions, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 2436.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2436. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Sub |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/04/2024 10:30AM Senate Lounge. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Subcommittee: Garrett, Reichman, and Taylor, T. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Subcommittee: Kraayenbrink, Reichman, and Taylor, T. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
SF2436 (Replaced by) 2024-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 964.
HF2695 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 891.
HF2695 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 891.