PA HB1490 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Act No. 38 of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of February 14, 1986 (P.L.2, No.2), known as the Acupuncture Licensure Act, further providing for definitions, for regulation of the practice of acupuncture, for penalties and for approval of acupuncture educational programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions, for regulation of the practice of acupuncture, for penalties and for approval of acupuncture educational programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1490 PN 3312, CONCURRENCE (Y: 119 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1490 PN 3312, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended A04909 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A04909 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1490 PN 2162, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 119 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1490 PN 2083, 2023 A2387 (Y: 101 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1490 PN 2083, 2023 A2510 (Y: 110 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A02282 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-01HouseAct No. 38 of 2024
2024-07-01HouseApproved by the Governor
2024-06-27HousePresented to the Governor
2024-06-27HouseSigned in Senate
2024-06-26HouseSigned in House
2024-06-26HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (119-83)
2024-06-26HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2024-06-26HouseReferred to RULES
2024-06-25HouseIn the House
2024-06-25SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-2)
2024-06-25SenateRe-reported as committed
2024-06-24SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2024-06-24SenateSecond consideration
2024-06-12SenateFirst consideration
2024-06-12SenateReported as amended
2023-10-19SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2023-10-18SenateIn the Senate
2023-10-18HouseThird consideration and final passage (119-84)
2023-10-18HouseRe-reported as committed
2023-10-17HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2023-10-17HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2023-10-04HouseRemoved from table
2023-10-03HouseLaid on the table
2023-10-03HouseFirst consideration
2023-10-03HouseReported as amended
2023-06-22HouseReferred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2023&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1490
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1490&pn=1696
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1490&pn=2083
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1490&pn=2162
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1490&pn=3312
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1490&pn=1696&aYear=2023&an=02282
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1490&pn=2083&aYear=2023&an=02510
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1490&pn=2083&aYear=2023&an=02387
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1490&pn=2162&aYear=2023&an=04909
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2023/0/HB1490P2162.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2023/0/HB1490P3312.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2023/0/HB1490P3312.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=10/03/2023&RollCallId=936
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=10/03/2023&RollCallId=937
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=624
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=625
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=649
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=62&theDate=10/18/2023&RollCallId=1015
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=7&theDate=06/12/2024&RollCallId=1031
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=7&theDate=06/12/2024&RollCallId=1030
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/25/2024&RollCallId=1092
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=532
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1272
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=67&theDate=06/26/2024&RollCallId=2084

Bill Comments

feedback