MA H4508 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Watertown be authorized to place municipal charge liens on certain properties in said city for nonpayment of any local charges, fees or fines. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Watertown to place municipal charge liens on certain properties in the city of Watertown for nonpayment of any local charge, fee or fine
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-03-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-21 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2461 (Similar To) 2023-10-12 - See H2910
H2622 (Similar To) 2023-04-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2023
H2910 (Similar To) 2023-10-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2023
H2622 (Similar To) 2023-04-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2023
H2910 (Similar To) 2023-10-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2023
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4508 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4508.pdf |