MA H2622 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to further regulating the appointment of special police officers in the city of Watertown. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Further regulating the appointment of special police officers in the city of Watertown
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2023 | |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2023-04-13 | House | Enacted |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2023-04-03 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-03-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-03-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-03-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-03-23 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-03-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/21/2023 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3730 (Similar To) 2023-06-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3931
H3930 (Similar To) 2024-01-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2416 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 47 of the Acts of 2024
H4141 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4510 (Similar To) 2024-04-24 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 25, 2024, pending concurrence
H3930 (Similar To) 2024-01-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2416 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 47 of the Acts of 2024
H4141 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4510 (Similar To) 2024-04-24 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 25, 2024, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2622 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2622.pdf |