IA SF2436 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 964.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 964.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the judicial branch, including by modifying the judicial retirement fund, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3203.) Effective date: 06/21/2024, 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the judicial branch, including by modifying the judicial retirement fund, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3203.) Effective date: 06/21/2024, 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 964. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | NOBA: Final |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 961. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 909. |
2024-04-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 891. |
2024-04-19 | House | Passed House, yeas 90, nays 1. H.J. 881. |
2024-04-19 | House | Substituted for HF 2695. H.J. 881. |
2024-04-18 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 850. |
2024-04-18 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 850. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 891. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 44, nays 0. S.J. 890. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Amendment S-5197 filed, adopted. S.J. 890. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 780. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 779. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3203 (Related) 2024-04-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2436.
HF2695 (Similar To) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 891.
HF2695 (Similar To) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 891.