IA HF2677 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the regulation of vapor products, and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 682.) Effective date: 07/01/2024
Title
A bill for an act relating to the regulation of vapor products, and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 682.) Effective date: 07/01/2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | Fiscal note. |
2024-04-26 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 04/26. |
2024-04-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 906. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 939. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 42, nays 4. S.J. 939. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5205 lost, as amended. S.J. 938. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5229 to S-5205 filed, adopted. S.J. 938. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5205 filed. S.J. 937. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5183 withdrawn. S.J. 937. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2402. S.J. 937. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Amendment S-5183 filed. S.J. 896. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read first time, attached to SF 2402. S.J. 745. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 745. |
2024-04-03 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 730. |
2024-04-04 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 738. |
2024-04-03 | House | Passed House, yeas 90, nays 4. H.J. 723. |
2024-04-03 | House | Amendment H-8265 adopted. H.J. 722. |
2024-04-02 | House | Amendment H-8265 filed. H.J. 715. |
2024-03-27 | House | Fiscal note. |
2024-03-27 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 685. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3101 (Related) 2024-02-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2402.
HSB682 (Related) 2024-03-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2677.
SF2402 (Similar To) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 939.
HSB682 (Related) 2024-03-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2677.
SF2402 (Similar To) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 939.