IA SSB3101 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2402
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2677
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2677
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2402.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2402.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the regulation of vapor products, and providing penalties.(See SF 2402.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the regulation of vapor products, and providing penalties.(See SF 2402.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2402. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2024 8:30AM Senate Lounge. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Cournoyer, Dotzler, and Klimesh. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Dotzler, and Koelker. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
HSB682 (Related) 2024-03-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2677.
SF2402 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 939.
HF2677 (Replaced by) 2024-05-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 940.
SF2402 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 939.
HF2677 (Replaced by) 2024-05-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 940.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3101 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3101.html |