IA HF2642 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 792.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 792.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to state departments and agencies from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund and the technology reinvestment fund, and providing for related matters, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 712.) Effective date: 06/30/2020, 07/01/2020. Applicability date: 06/01/2020, 07/01/2020.
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to state departments and agencies from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund and the technology reinvestment fund, and providing for related matters, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 712.) Effective date: 06/30/2020, 07/01/2020. Applicability date: 06/01/2020, 07/01/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-14 - House - Passed House (Y: 63 N: 29 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - Passed House (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - Passed House (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 792. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 792. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-14 | Senate | NOBA: Final |
2020-06-14 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 851. |
2020-06-14 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 781. |
2020-06-14 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-14 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-14 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 787. |
2020-06-14 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 787. |
2020-06-14 | House | Passed House, yeas 63, nays 29. H.J. 771. |
2020-06-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8318. H.J. 770. |
2020-06-14 | House | Senate amendment H-8318 filed. H.J. 770. |
2020-06-13 | House | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2020-06-14 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 769. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | NOBA: House Floor |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 835. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 861. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 2. S.J. 834. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Amendment S-5159 filed, adopted. S.J. 833. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2417. S.J. 833. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Read first time, attached to similar SF 2417. S.J. 804. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 804. |
2020-06-12 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 743. |
2020-06-12 | House | Passed House, yeas 58, nays 39. H.J. 731. |
2020-06-12 | House | Amendment H-8290 adopted, as amended. H.J. 730. |
2020-06-12 | House | Amendment H-8300 to amendment H-8290 filed, adopted. H.J. 730. |
2020-06-12 | House | Amendment H-8278 lost. H.J. 730. |
2020-06-12 | House | Amendment H-8249 withdrawn. H.J. 730. |
2020-06-11 | House | Amendments H-8278 and H-8290 filed. H.J. 712. |
2020-06-10 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2020-06-10 | House | Amendment H-8249 filed. H.J. 690. |
2020-06-10 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 672. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB712 (Related) 2020-06-10 - Committee report, approving bill. H.J. 690.
SSB3204 (Related) 2020-06-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2417.
SF2417 (Similar To) 2020-06-13 - Withdrawn. S.J. 834.
SSB3204 (Related) 2020-06-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2417.
SF2417 (Similar To) 2020-06-13 - Withdrawn. S.J. 834.