IA SF2417 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - Withdrawn. S.J. 834.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to state departments and agencies from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund and the technology reinvestment fund, and providing for related matters, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 3204.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to state departments and agencies from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund and the technology reinvestment fund, and providing for related matters, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 3204.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-13SenateWithdrawn. S.J. 834.
2020-06-13SenateHF 2642 substituted. S.J. 833.
2020-06-13SenateAmendment S-5156 filed, adopted. S.J. 833.
2020-06-13SenateAttached to similar HF 2642. S.J. 804.
2020-06-11SenateNOBA: Senate Full Approps
2020-06-11SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 780.
2020-06-11SenateIntroduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 780.

Same As/Similar To

HSB712 (Related) 2020-06-10 - Committee report, approving bill. H.J. 690.
HF2642 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 792.
SSB3204 (Related) 2020-06-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2417.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback