IA HF2369 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 753.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 753.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act setting the dates for the submission of local public measures to the electors. (Formerly HSB 514.)
Title
A bill for an act setting the dates for the submission of local public measures to the electors. (Formerly HSB 514.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 753. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 712. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Smith, Chapman, and Dvorsky. S.J. 668. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 621. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 621. |
2018-03-08 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 548. |
2018-03-08 | House | Passed House, ayes 52 nays 44. H.J. 547. |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 277. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB514 (Related) 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.