IA HF2258 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 380.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 380.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the provision of emergency medical services by a physician and surgeon or osteopathic physician and surgeon and the definition of first responder.(See HF 2507.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the provision of emergency medical services by a physician and surgeon or osteopathic physician and surgeon and the definition of first responder.(See HF 2507.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 380. |
2024-02-14 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2507. |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 258. |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-02-05 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2024 10:30AM House Lounge. |
2024-02-05 | House | Subcommittee: Wilz, H., Baeth and Kniff McCulla. H.J. 197. |
2024-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 178. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2148 (Similar To) 2024-03-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 570.
HF2507 (Similar To) 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.
HF2507 (Similar To) 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2258 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2258.html |