IA HF2507 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the provision of emergency medical services by a physician and surgeon or osteopathic physician and surgeon and the definition of first responder. (Formerly HF 2258.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the provision of emergency medical services by a physician and surgeon or osteopathic physician and surgeon and the definition of first responder. (Formerly HF 2258.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 773. |
2024-04-10 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 772. |
2024-03-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 613. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 572. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 570. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2148. S.J. 569. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 536. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read first time, attached to SF 2148. S.J. 375. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 375. |
2024-02-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 380. |
2024-03-04 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 496. |
2024-02-22 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays 0. H.J. 369. |
2024-02-14 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 264. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2148 (Similar To) 2024-03-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 570.
HF2258 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 380.
HF2258 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 380.