IA HF2069 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2413.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2413.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the registration requirements for certain vessels and the use of registration fees, and making penalties applicable.(See HF 2413.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the registration requirements for certain vessels and the use of registration fees, and making penalties applicable.(See HF 2413.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2413. |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 262. |
2022-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2022 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2022-01-20 | House | Subcommittee: Gerhold, Brown-Powers and Jeneary. H.J. 105. |
2022-01-20 | House | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 103. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2413 (Similar To) 2022-03-15 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2069 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2069.html |