IA HF2413 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the registration requirements for certain vessels, requiring water use permits, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HF 2069.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the registration requirements for certain vessels, requiring water use permits, making appropriations, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HF 2069.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-03-14 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/15/2022 12:30PM House Lounge 2. |
2022-03-14 | House | Subcommittee: Maxwell, Graber and Wolfe. H.J. 567. |
2022-02-16 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 267. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2069 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2413.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2413 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2413.html |