IA HF169 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 547.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 547.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the required reporting of the administration of vaccines and immunizations to the statewide immunization registry, and providing for licensee discipline.(See HF 547.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the required reporting of the administration of vaccines and immunizations to the statewide immunization registry, and providing for licensee discipline.(See HF 547.)
Sponsors
Rep. Joel Fry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 547. |
2021-02-11 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 385. |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2021 12:30PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2021-01-25 | House | Subcommittee: Bacon, Andrews and Forbes. H.J. 196. |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 182. |
Same As/Similar To
HF547 (Similar To) 2021-04-15 - Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 965.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF169 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF169.html |