IA HF133 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 731.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 731.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to refund payments made in connection with motor vehicle debt cancellation coverage. (Formerly HSB 32.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.
Title
A bill for an act relating to refund payments made in connection with motor vehicle debt cancellation coverage. (Formerly HSB 32.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 731. |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 726. |
2023-02-15 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 313. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 328. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 327. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Substituted for SF 131. S.J. 327. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Read first time, attached to SF 131. S.J. 243. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 243. |
2023-02-01 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 225. |
2023-02-01 | House | Passed House, yeas 99, nays 0. H.J. 223. |
2023-01-26 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 194. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1020 (Related) 2023-01-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 131.
HSB32 (Related) 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 133.
SF131 (Similar To) 2023-02-15 - Withdrawn. S.J. 328.
HSB32 (Related) 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 133.
SF131 (Similar To) 2023-02-15 - Withdrawn. S.J. 328.