HI SR93 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-06-11.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-06-11.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Developers And Homebuilders To Consider Either The Installation Of Automatic Sprinklers Or Application Of Certified Fire-retardant Coatings In Newly Constructed One- And Two-family Residential Dwellings, Depending On The Preference Of The Homeowner.
Title
Fire Sprinklers; Fire-Retardant Coating; Residential Dwellings
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-06-11. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) One Day Notice 04-19-11. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Reported from PGM/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1313) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-04-07 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga. | |
2011-04-07 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Ryan, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM/WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 04-07-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) Referred to PGM/WLH. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Offered. |