HI SR88 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-06-11.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-06-11.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Department Of Human Services To Consider Implementing The My Safe Drawer Computer Application For Foster Youth Who Are Transitioning Out Of The Foster Care System.
Title
Department of Human Services; Foster Youth; My Safe Drawer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-06-11. | |
2011-04-05 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. | |
2011-04-04 | (S) One Day Notice 04-05-11. | |
2011-04-04 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1047) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2011-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-11 3:30PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) Referred to HMS. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=88 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SR88_.HTM |