HI SR81 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR81
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States To Satisfy Its Obligations To The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands And The Hawaiian Home Lands Trust Under The Hawaiian Home Lands Recovery Act.
Title
Urging The United States To Satisfy Its Obligations To The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands And The Hawaiian Home Lands Trust Under The Hawaiian Home Lands Recovery Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-22. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported from HWN/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3654) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Fevella. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Acasio, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fevella. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HWN/PSM. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR81 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Referred to HMS.
SCR91 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 45
SCR91 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 45