HI SR65 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR65
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Budget And Finance To Examine Participation By The State In The Powerball And Mega Millions Multistate Lottery Games And The Allocation Of The Income From Those Games To The General Fund.
Title
Urging The Department Of Budget And Finance To Examine Participation By The State In The Powerball And Mega Millions Multistate Lottery Games And The Allocation Of The Income From Those Games To The General Fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-19 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR65 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=65&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SR65_.HTM |