HI SR39 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR39
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Counties To Expand Property Tax Relief For Lands Purchased Pursuant To The Kuleana Act.
Title
Urging The Counties To Expand Property Tax Relief For Lands Purchased Pursuant To The Kuleana Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-24 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-25-21. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HWN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1115) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Acasio, Ihara. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-21 9:55AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to HWN/WAM. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR39 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR57 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 31
SCR57 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 31