HI SR31 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Hawaii Housing Finance And Development Corporation To Amend The Priority For Which Low-income Housing Tax Credits Are Allocated And Moneys In The Rental Housing Revolving Fund Are Used And To Adopt Certain Administrative Rules That Incentivize The Development Of Affordable Housing In The State.
Title
Urging The Hawaii Housing Finance And Development Corporation To Amend The Priority For Which Low-income Housing Tax Credits Are Allocated And Moneys In The Rental Housing Revolving Fund Are Used And To Adopt Certain Administrative Rules That Incentivize The Development Of Affordable Housing In The State.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Senate | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-03-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-01-24. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3385) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to HOU/WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR43 (Same As) 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Subjects
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation
Low-income Housing Tax Credit
Prioritization
Qualified Allocation Plan
Rental Housing Revolving Fund
Low-income Housing Tax Credit
Prioritization
Qualified Allocation Plan
Rental Housing Revolving Fund