HI SR25 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR25
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs' Division Of Financial Institutions And The Hawaii Technology Development Corporation To Extend The Digital Currency Innovation Lab Pilot Project.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs' Division Of Financial Institutions And The Hawaii Technology Development Corporation To Extend The Digital Currency Innovation Lab Pilot Project.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 10:15AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to CPN/EET. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR25 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HR115 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR30 (Same As) 2022-03-22 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
HR115 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR30 (Same As) 2022-03-22 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Subjects
Cryptocurrency
Digital Currency
Digital Currency Innovation Lab Pilot Project
Division of Financial Institutions
Hawaii Technology Development Corporation
Digital Currency
Digital Currency Innovation Lab Pilot Project
Division of Financial Institutions
Hawaii Technology Development Corporation
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=25&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SR25_.HTM |