HI SR209 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR209
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Assess And Report To The Legislature Whether And To What Extent Existing Curriculum And Training Align With Erin's Law.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Assess And Report To The Legislature Whether And To What Extent Existing Curriculum And Training Align With Erin's Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-22. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3539) with recommendation of adoption. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kanuha. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-22 3:15PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR209 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Referred to GVO, JDC.
HR29 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - Referred to EDN, JHA, referral sheet 23
SCR216 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
HR29 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - Referred to EDN, JHA, referral sheet 23
SCR216 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.